Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Antonio Dal Pozzo

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1547Born
17 Sep 158234.7AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
13 Jul 160759.6DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Antonio Dal Pozzo (VIAF: 254004023)
Archbishop Carlo Antonio Dal Pozzo (born , died ) Archbishop of Pisa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiella
Death PlaceSeravezza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 274
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1582, Number 23*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast