Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Giovanni del Papa, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1850Born
1871²20.7ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1876²25.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Sep 190454.5AppointedAbbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy
13 Mar 191867.9DiedAbbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni del Papa
Abbot Giovanni del Papa O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLecce dei Marsi

  • a priest for 42.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1918
  • b: Catholic Encyclopedia, Volume 17, Page 666

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast