Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Dovanlia

Deceased

Bishop of Nicopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1733¹BornPhilippopolitan
1 May 175623.3Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jul 177138.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria
16 Oct 177643.8AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
6 Apr 177744.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
6 Jul 180471.5DiedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Dovanlia:
Bishop Paul Dovanlia (died ) Bishop of Nicopoli

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 310, and Page 384
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,170
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 282

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013