Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Donnadieu, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Papoul


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Mar 1608AppointedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
5 Jun 1608Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
3 Apr 1626DiedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France

MicroData Summary for François de Donnadieu:
Bishop François de Donnadieu O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Saint-Papoul

  • a bishop for 17.8 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,882

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013