Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Tommaso Donato, O.P. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Oct 1492AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
30 Nov 1492Ordained BishopPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
11 Nov 1504DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Donato
Patriarch Tommaso Donato O.P. (died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a bishop for 11.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 8 Feb 2017
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 329

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast