Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Francesco Dominquez, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Monopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1642BornMilano
20 Mar 166623.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
7 Apr 170462.0AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
Feb 1706³63.8DiedBishop of Monopoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Francesco Dominquez:
Bishop Alfonso Francesco Dominquez O.E.S.A. (born , died Feb 1706) Bishop of Monopoli

  • a priest for 39.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 273
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 7 Jan 2016