Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Domec

Deceased

Bishop of Albarracin


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Dec 1631AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
1632²Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
17 Nov 1635AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
14 Sep 1644DiedBishop of Albarracin, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vicente Domec:
Bishop Vicente Domec (died ) Bishop of Albarracin

  • a bishop for 12.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 74, and Page 205
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 157, Number 991

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015