Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Leonardo Dolfin

Deceased

Archbishop of Candia {Crete}, Greece


Events

DateEventTitle
1380¹AppointedBishop of Asolo (Cittanova; Eraclea), Italy
7 May 1387AppointedArchbishop of Candia {Crete}, Greece
29 Apr 1392AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Castello, Italy
27 Jul 1401AppointedAdministrator of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
27 Aug 1401AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
14 Sep 1408AppointedArchbishop of Candia {Crete}, Greece
1415²DiedArchbishop of Candia {Crete}, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Dolfin
Patriarch Leonardo Dolfin (died 1415) Archbishop of Candia {Crete}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 171, and Page 83
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 215, and Page 191
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 216, and Page 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Aug 2021

Quantcast