Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Doc, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Laon, France


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Mar 1552AppointedBishop of Laon, France
1 May 1552Ordained BishopBishop of Laon, France
1 Jul 1560DiedBishop of Laon, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Doc (VIAF: 85908735)
Bishop Jean Doc O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Laon

  • a bishop for 8.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 220
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,352
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1552, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast