Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Job von Dobenek, O.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pomesania (Pomezania)


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Aug 1501AppointedBishop of Pomesania (Pomezania), Poland
16 Oct 1502Ordained BishopBishop of Pomesania (Pomezania), Poland
15 May 1521DiedBishop of Pomesania (Pomezania), Poland

MicroData Summary for Job von Dobenek:
Bishop Job von Dobenek O.T. (died ) Bishop of Pomesania (Pomezania)

  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 218
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,812

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013