Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martino de Martinis, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Mar 1574AppointedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
20 Feb 1581AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
25 Sep 1582DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Martino de Martinis:
Bishop Martino de Martinis S.J. (died ) Bishop of San Severo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 273, and Page 168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013