Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Luxembourg

Deceased

Bishop of Le Mans, France

Bishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Nov 1502AppointedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
27 Jan 1507AppointedBishop of Le Mans, France
18 Apr 1507Ordained BishopBishop of Le Mans, France
9 Sep 1509DiedBishop of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for François de Luxembourg
Bishop François de Luxembourg (died ) Bishop of Le Mans

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCordeliers, Church, Le Mans, Diocese of Le Mans
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 162, and Page 277
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,315
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1502, Number 36*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 218
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1507, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 May 2018

Quantcast