Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Antonio de la Portilla, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1651¹Born
12 May 170251.3AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
21 May 170251.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca, Spain
7 Jun 171160.4DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Antonio de la Portilla
Bishop Francisco Antonio de la Portilla O.F.M. (born 1651, died ) Bishop of Mallorca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVéjoria

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 252
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 22, Number 24
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 42
  • ob/c2: AT, 23 May 2015
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,428

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast