Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Julian Edward Dillon, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Shashi [Shasi], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1897Born
3 Oct 192528.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
21 Dec 192932.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
11 Jul 193639.4AppointedPrefect of Shashi [Shasi], China
25 Jun 196164.4DiedPrefect of Shashi [Shasi], China

MicroData Summary for Julian Edward Dillon
Father Julian Edward Dillon O.F.M. (born , died ) Prefect of Shashi [Shasi]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBristol, Diocese of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
Death PlaceLotung, Taiwan

  • a priest for 31.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast