Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Difnico

Deceased

Bishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1498¹Born
26 Sep 152325.7AppointedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
22 Feb 152426.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
8 Aug 153032.6SucceededBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
1554¹56.0DiedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Difnico
Bishop Giacomo Difnico (born 1498, died 1554) Bishop of Nona (Nin)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Onuphre, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 260
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1524, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jun 2018

Quantcast