Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Díaz Aux de Armendáriz, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1573¹BornQuito, Ecuador
21 Aug 161744.6AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
8 Aug 162249.6AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
3 Jan 162754.0DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis Díaz Aux de Armendáriz:
Bishop Luis Díaz Aux de Armendáriz O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Urgell

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 353, and Page 205
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 135, Number 866

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 6 Jan 2014