Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique d’Esclaux de Mesplez (Messelez)

Deceased

Bishop of Lescar, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1636¹Born
31 Jul 168145.5SelectedBishop of Lescar, France
1 Dec 168145.9ConfirmedBishop of Lescar, France
19 Apr 168246.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lescar, France
23 Jan 171680.0DiedBishop of Lescar, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominique d’Esclaux de Mesplez (Messelez)
Bishop Dominique d’Esclaux de Mesplez (Messelez) (born 1636, died ) Bishop of Lescar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDax

  • a bishop for 33.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 237
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast