Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Plácido de Quirós de Porras, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1652²Born
7 Apr 169846.2AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
9 Dec 169846.9InstalledBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
9 Mar 169947.1DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Plácido de Quirós de Porras
Bishop Manuel Plácido de Quirós de Porras O.S.B. (born 1652, died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTineo Oviedo, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 240, Number 1,488
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 88
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast