Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Stefan Demurov

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Tiflis and Georgia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1871²Born
1902²31.0Ordained PriestPriest of Tiraspol, Moldova
23 May 192655.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tiflis and Georgia
24 Feb 193867.1DiedApostolic Administrator of Tiflis and Georgia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefan Demurov
Father Stefan Demurov (born 1871, died ) Apostolic Administrator of Tiflis and Georgia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTiflis

  • a priest for 36.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 29 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast