Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Vinzenz Maria Demetz, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Lingling [Yungchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1893Born
1947²53.6AppointedPrefect of Lingling [Yungchow], China
1948²54.6ResignedPrefect of Lingling [Yungchow], China
21 Aug 196774.2DiedPrefect Emeritus of Lingling [Yungchow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vinzenz Maria Demetz
Father Vinzenz Maria Demetz O.F.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Lingling [Yungchow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAustria

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 30 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast