Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jerónimo de Loaysa, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1489¹Born
5 Dec 153748.9AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
29 Jun 153849.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
13 May 154152.3AppointedBishop of Lima, Peru
12 Feb 154657.1AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
25 Oct 157586.8DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo de Loaysa (VIAF: 50564916)
Archbishop Jerónimo de Loaysa O.P. (born 1489, died ) Archbishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrujillo, Spain

  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 49, Number 260
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 154, and Page 225

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 30 Oct 2017