Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Delenda

Deceased

Bishop of Santorini {Thira}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1745BornSantorino
25 Mar 177024.8Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 177429.0AppointedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
20 Mar 180761.8DiedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece

MicroData Summary for Pietro Delenda:
Bishop Pietro Delenda (born , died ) Bishop of Santorini {Thira}

  • a priest for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 366
  • ob/d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 333

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013