Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Caspar Delenda

Deceased

Bishop of Santorini {Thira}


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Mar 1815AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
20 Mar 1815AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
19 Jul 1815SucceededBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
16 Sep 1825DiedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece

MicroData Summary for Caspar Delenda:
Bishop Caspar Delenda (died ) Bishop of Santorini {Thira}

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 333, and Page 379

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013