Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bertrand Cardinal de Déaulx

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Aug 1323AppointedArchbishop of Embrun, France
18 Dec 1338AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
18 Dec 1338Elevated to Cardinal
4 Nov 1348AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
21 Oct 1355DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

MicroData Summary for Bertrand de Déaulx:
Cardinal Bertrand de Déaulx (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a cardinal for 16.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013