Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico degli Atti (De Actis)

Deceased

Bishop of Segni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575¹BornTuderti
26 Feb 160025.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Aug 162550.6AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
20 Dec 163157.0DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico degli Atti (De Actis):
Bishop Ludovico degli Atti (De Actis) (died ) Bishop of Segni

  • a priest for 31.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 315

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013