Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Maria della Ciaja, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sovana (Soana)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1642³BornSienne
30 Nov 167028.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
14 Jun 168845.7AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
23 Jan 171370.3DiedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Maria della Ciaja:
Bishop Domenico Maria della Ciaja O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Sovana (Soana)

  • a priest for 42.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 365
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015