Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul David a Felistal

Deceased

Bishop of Veszprém


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1573¹BornSchialocles
1610²37.0SelectedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
1625²52.0SelectedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
18 Jul 162855.5SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
6 Oct 163158.7AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
19 Jan 163360.0DiedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul David a Felistal:
Bishop Paul David a Felistal (born 1573, died ) Bishop of Veszprém

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 290, and Page 337
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 356, and Page 366
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 381, and Page 382
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015