Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonçalo (Gonzalo) da Silva

Deceased

Bishop of Ceuta and Tanger, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1568¹Born
4 Feb 161345.0AppointedBishop of Malacca, Singapore
1615¹47.0Ordained BishopBishop of Malacca, Singapore
6 Sep 163264.6AppointedBishop of Ceuta and Tanger, Spain
16 Feb 164981.1DiedBishop of Ceuta and Tanger, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gonçalo (Gonzalo) da Silva
Bishop Gonçalo (Gonzalo) da Silva (born 1568, died ) Bishop of Ceuta and Tanger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRedondo, Portugal

  • a bishop for 34.1 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,381
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 313, and Page 228
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast