Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime de Aragón

Deceased

Bishop of Valencia

Note/Previous Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1341BornValencia
10 Jan 136221.0AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
5 Mar 136928.2AppointedBishop of Valencia, Spain
30 May 139655.4DiedBishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jaime de Aragón:
Bishop Jaime de Aragón (died ) Bishop of Valencia

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013