Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro De Andrea

Deceased

Bishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1611¹Born
10 Mar 166150.1SelectedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
8 Aug 166150.6ConfirmedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
25 Mar 166352.2DiedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gennaro De Andrea
Bishop Gennaro De Andrea (born 1611, died ) Bishop of Mottola (Motula)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Death PlaceMottola, Diocese of Mottola (Motula)
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Mottola, Diocese of Mottola (Motula)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 250
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1661, Number 24
  • b: AT, 7 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 8 Nov 2018

Quantcast