Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ercole Cardinal Dandini

Deceased

Prefect of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina

Titular See: (Pref/Good Government)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1759Born
10 Mar 182363.6AppointedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
10 Mar 182363.6Elevated to Cardinal
16 May 182363.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
23 May 182464.8ResignedBishop-Elect of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
3 Mar 182868.6AppointedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other
22 Jul 184080.9DiedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Ercole Dandini
Ercole Cardinal Dandini (born , died ) Prefect of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 17.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 98
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Mar 1823

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast