Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Cesare Dalceggio, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Pro-Vicar Apostolic of Northwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Settentrionale}, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1821Born
1844²22.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
1849²27.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
1871²49.2AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Northwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Settentrionale}, China
2 Aug 187149.8DiedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Northwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Settentrionale}, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cesare Dalceggio
Father Cesare Dalceggio O.F.M. (born , died ) Pro-Vicar Apostolic of Northwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTelve, Italy

  • a priest for 22.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 28 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast