Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René de Daillon du Lude

Deceased

Bishop of Bayeux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1526¹Born
13 Sep 155327.6AppointedBishop of Luçon, France
1562¹36.0ResignedBishop-Elect of Luçon, France
11 Feb 159872.1AppointedBishop of Bayeux, France
8 Mar 160074.1DiedBishop of Bayeux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for René de Daillon du Lude (VIAF: 90749334)
Bishop René de Daillon du Lude (born 1526, died ) Bishop of Bayeux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 107
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 127, and Page 230
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1553
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1598, Number 3*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast