Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccol˛ dell’Acciaia

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Marittima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1636BornSenen
20 Apr 167135.3AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
26 Apr 167135.3Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
Aug 167943.6DiedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccol˛ dell’Acciaia:
Bishop Niccol˛ dell’Acciaia , Bishop of Massa Marittima

  • a bishop for 8.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Mar 2014