Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume-Joseph d’Abzac de Mayac

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Papoul, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1731Born
8 Jul 177443.4SelectedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
3 Apr 177544.2ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
7 May 177544.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
23 Jan 178453.0DiedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume-Joseph d’Abzac de Mayac
Bishop Guillaume-Joseph d’Abzac de Mayac (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Papoul

EventPlace
Birth PlacePérigord

  • a bishop for 8.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast