Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicholas Cusack, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kildare, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Nov 1279AppointedBishop of Kildare, Ireland
15 May 1280Ordained BishopBishop of Kildare, Ireland
5 Sep 1299DiedBishop of Kildare, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Cusack
Bishop Nicholas Cusack O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Kildare

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMeath
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Kildare, Diocese of Kildare

  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,874

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast