Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucas Cuartas Oviedo

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1683BornAlmagro
12 Jun 171834.5Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 173551.3SelectedBishop of Huesca, Spain
27 Jul 173551.6ConfirmedBishop of Huesca, Spain
Oct 1735³51.8Ordained BishopBishop of Huesca, Spain
1 Dec 173653.0DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lucas Cuartas Oviedo:
Bishop Lucas Cuartas Oviedo (born , died ) Bishop of Huesca

  • a priest for 18.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,881
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 53, Number 231
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 42
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 320

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015