Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Walter of Coutances

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen, France


Events

DateEventTitle
1183¹AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
2 Jul 1183Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 1183Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
1184¹AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
16 Nov 1207DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Walter of Coutances
Archbishop Walter of Coutances (died ) Archbishop of Rouen

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. Laud, Church, Angers, Diocese of Angers

  • a priest for 24.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 50
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 8
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,904
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 192, and Page 614
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 49, Number 3,323
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,753

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast