Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilberto Cruilles

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Oct 1334AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
1 Jan 1335Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
12 Jun 1335DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gilberto Cruilles:
Bishop Gilberto Cruilles (died ) Bishop of Gerona

  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 303, Number 151
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014