Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Philip Crolly

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Clogher, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Nov 1651AppointedVicar Apostolic of Clogher, Ireland
17 Apr 1657AppointedVicar Apostolic of Clogher, Ireland
22 Aug 1663³DiedVicar Apostolic of Clogher, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philip Crolly
Father Philip Crolly (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Clogher

Source(s):
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast