Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Crispini

Deceased

Bishop of Amelia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1639³BornRocca Guglielmo
10 Apr 166223.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Apr 166223.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Sep 168546.5AppointedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
13 Nov 169051.7AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
12 May 172182.2DiedBishop of Amelia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Crispini:
Bishop Giuseppe Crispini (born , died ) Bishop of Amelia

  • a priest for 59.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 81, and Page 415
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015