Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco (Matteo) Crescesi

Deceased

Bishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1747BornShkodrŽ
11 Apr 179143.5AppointedBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
5 Jun 179143.7Ordained BishopBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
24 Jan 180860.3DiedBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania

MicroData Summary for Marco (Matteo) Crescesi:
Bishop Marco (Matteo) Crescesi (born , died ) Bishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari)

  • a bishop for 16.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 370
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 337

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013