Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Creagh

Deceased

Bishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1707²Born
19 Dec 173326.9Ordained PriestPriest
3 Apr 174538.2SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
12 Apr 174538.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
12 Apr 174538.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
Aug 1747³40.5SucceededBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
12 Feb 177568.1DiedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Creagh
Bishop Peter Creagh (born 1707, died ) Bishop of Waterford and Lismore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDangan, Co. Clare
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)old Carrickbeg, Cemetery

  • a priest for 41.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 108, and Page 446
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 27
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast