Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop David Creagh

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
10 May 1484AppointedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
14 Jun 1484Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
5 Sep 1503DiedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland

MicroData Summary for David Creagh
Archbishop David Creagh (died ) Archbishop of Cashel

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. Jacques des espagnols, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 120
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1484, Number 9
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 85, Number 7,028
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,371

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast