Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Cozza, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1654BornGrotte di S. Lorenzo, Italy
15 May 172369.1AppointedMinister General of Order of Observant Friars Minor
9 Dec 172672.6Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 172672.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
20 Jan 172772.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
19 Jan 172974.7DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Cozza:
Lorenzo Cardinal Cozza O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

  • a cardinal for 2.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Dec 1726

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015