Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jean-Baptiste Coudray, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Kankan, Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1913Born
1940²26.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
14 Dec 195845.1AppointedPrefect of Kankan, Guinea
197965.2ResignedPrefect of Kankan, Guinea
22 May 199076.6DiedPrefect Emeritus of Kankan, Guinea

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Coudray
Father Jean-Baptiste Coudray C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Kankan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArdon, Diocese of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

  • a priest for 50.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 18 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 19 Dec 2018

Quantcast