Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Baldassare Cardinal Cossa

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

Titular See: (Antipope John XXIII)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1365¹BornIschia
27 Feb 140237.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
27 Feb 140237.1Elevated to Cardinal
17 May 141045.3SelectedBishop
24 May 141045.3Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 141045.3Ordained BishopBishop
29 May 141550.4RemovedBishop
23 Jun 141954.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
22 Dec 141954.9DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baldassare Cossa:
Baldassare Cardinal Cossa (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

  • a priest for 9.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
  • a cardinal for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Feb 1402
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,363
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,200

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015