Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giovanni Corboli Bussi

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1813Born
1840²26.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 184733.8AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
9 Jul 185036.7DiedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Corboli Bussi (VIAF: 88762543)
Father Giovanni Corboli Bussi (born , died ) Secretary of Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrbino
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 10.5 years

Source(s):
  • b/x933: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 21
  • b: Treccani.it, 9 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast