Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hildebrand Conti

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jun 1319AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
28 Jun 1321Ordained BishopBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
2 Nov 1352DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Hildebrand Conti
Bishop Hildebrand Conti (died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 385, and Page 386
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,860

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 6 May 2019

Quantcast