Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Consolini

Deceased

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1806BornSenigalia, Italy
22 Jun 186660.0Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 186660.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
24 Mar 188477.8AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
20 Dec 188478.5DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Domenico Consolini:
Cardinal Domenico Consolini (born , died ) Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of Apostolic Chamber

  • a cardinal for 18.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 55, and Page 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013